DC B23-1020 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 28, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 28, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
UDC PR Harris Exclusive Use Repeal Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
UDC PR Harris Exclusive Use Repeal Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 28, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-1020 Published in the DC Register |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2020-12-15 | Council | First Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |