DC B25-0238 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Act A25-0079 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006137, Expires on Jul 23, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Act A25-0079 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006137, Expires on Jul 23, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 2 and 3 to Contract No. DCAM-22-AE-0007 with BELL Architects, P.C. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Title
Modification Nos. 2 and 3 to Contract No. DCAM-22-AE-0007 with BELL Architects, P.C. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Council | Act A25-0079 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006137, Expires on Jul 23, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-04-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0079, Expires on Jul 23, 2023 |
2023-04-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-04-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-03-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |