DC B25-0627 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Law L25-0149, Effective from Mar 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003865, Expires on Nov 03, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Law L25-0149, Effective from Mar 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003865, Expires on Nov 03, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-01-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-19 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-19 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Council | Law L25-0149, Effective from Mar 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003865, Expires on Nov 03, 2024 |
2024-02-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-02-09 | Council | Act A25-0381 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001448 |
2024-02-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-02-01 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0381 |
2024-01-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 5, 2024 |
2024-01-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-12-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0627 Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-19 | Council | First Reading |
2023-12-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |