DC B25-0709 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Autonomous Vehicle Testing Permit Requirement Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Autonomous Vehicle Testing Permit Requirement Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 14, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0449 |
2024-04-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 23, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0709 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-02-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |