DC B25-0721 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Act A25-0424 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003517, Expires on Jun 23, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Act A25-0424 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003517, Expires on Jun 23, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council Information Sharing Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council Information Sharing Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Council | Act A25-0424 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003517, Expires on Jun 23, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-03-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0424, Expires on Jun 23, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 29, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |