DC B25-0762 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Health Care Alliance Financial Eligibility Rulemaking Approval Emergency Act of 2024
Title
District of Columbia Health Care Alliance Financial Eligibility Rulemaking Approval Emergency Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0440, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 |
2024-04-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 22, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |