DC B25-0764 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0442 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004621, Expires on Jul 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0442 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004621, Expires on Jul 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Virtual Open Meetings Authority Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Virtual Open Meetings Authority Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Council | Act A25-0442 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004621, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-15 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0442, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 |
2024-04-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 22, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |