DC PR20-1115 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0679 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0679 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract Number Cw30851 Washington Hospitality Foundation Contract Approval And Payment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Title
Contract Number Cw30851 Washington Hospitality Foundation Contract Approval And Payment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Council | Resolution R20-0679 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12000 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-10-23 | Council | PR20-1115 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |