DC PR21-0879 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-09 - Resolution R21-0651 Effective from November 15, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15056
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-09 - Resolution R21-0651 Effective from November 15, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15056
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Technical Amendment Approval Resolution Of 2016
Title
Technical Amendment Approval Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-15 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-09 | Council | Resolution R21-0651 Effective from November 15, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15056 |
2016-11-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR21-0879 |
2016-11-15 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-11-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0651 |
2016-11-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR21-0879 |
2016-10-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-09-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0879 Published in the DC Register |
2016-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole, Subcommittee on Local Business Development and Utilities |
2016-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |