DC PR21-1039 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Resolution R21-0685 Effective from December 6, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15357
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Resolution R21-0685 Effective from December 6, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15357
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tipping contract with PFC Associates, LLC
Leg agenda 12/6/16
Title
Contract No. Dcfa-2015-c-2292ss With Pfc Associates, Llc Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Council | Resolution R21-0685 Effective from December 6, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15357 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0685 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-11-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |