DC PR22-0552 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Approved with Resolution Number R22-0484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Approved with Resolution Number R22-0484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense Of The Council In Opposition To Concealed Carry Reciprocity Resolution Of 2017
Title
Sense Of The Council In Opposition To Concealed Carry Reciprocity Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0484 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Resolution R22-0484 Effective from May 11, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5122 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-04-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0552 |
2018-03-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-03-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0552 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-10-17 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |