DC PR22-0717 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Resolution R22-0482 Effective from May 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Resolution R22-0482 Effective from May 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
1125 Spring Road, N.w., Disposition Approval Resolution Of 2018
Title
1125 Spring Road, N.w., Disposition Approval Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Council | Resolution R22-0482 Effective from May 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5117 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0482 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-04-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0717 |
2018-03-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-03-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0717 Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2018-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |