DC PR22-0845 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Resolution R22-0489 Effective from May 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Resolution R22-0489 Effective from May 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With KPMG LLP to approve CA 22-466
Title
Contract No. Dhcf-2017-c0026 Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Council | Resolution R22-0489 Effective from May 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5128 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0489 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-05-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-04-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |