DC PR22-1138 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - Resolution R22-0663 Effective from November 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13355
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - Resolution R22-0663 Effective from November 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13355
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Warehousing And Storage Eminent Domain Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Warehousing And Storage Eminent Domain Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Council | Resolution R22-0663 Effective from November 27, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13355 |
2018-11-27 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0663 |
2018-11-27 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-11-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-11-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |