DC PR22-1167 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Resolution R22-0718 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Resolution R22-0718 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Power Line Underground Program Certified Business Enterprise Utilization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Power Line Underground Program Certified Business Enterprise Utilization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-04 | Council | Resolution R22-0718 Effective from December 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 42 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0718 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-12-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |