DC PR23-0069 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Resolution R23-0055 Effective from April 2, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State Superintendent Of Education Hanseul Kang Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Superintendent Of Education Hanseul Kang Confirmation Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28CouncilResolution R23-0055 Effective from April 2, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7618
2019-06-10CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-04-02CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0069
2019-04-02CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-04-02CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0055
2019-03-22CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-03-21CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0069
2019-03-06CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2019-02-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-01-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-11CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0069 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-07CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback