DC PR23-0924 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Resolution R23-0627, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14806
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Resolution R23-0627, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14806
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Rental Housing Commission Lisa M. Gregory Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Title
The Rental Housing Commission Lisa M. Gregory Confirmation Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-25 | Council | Resolution R23-0627, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14806 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0627 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-12-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0924 |
2020-11-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-11-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0924 Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |