DC PR23-0988 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Resolution R23-0588, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13505
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Resolution R23-0588, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13505
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gallaudet University Revenue and Refunding Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2020
Title
Gallaudet University Revenue and Refunding Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | Council | Resolution R23-0588, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13505 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0588 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-11-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0988 |
2020-10-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0988 Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2020-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |