DC PR25-0003 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-20 - Resolution R25-0003, Effective from Jan 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 000671
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-20 - Resolution R25-0003, Effective from Jan 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 000671
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Counsel to the Council of the District of Columbia Nicole Streeter Reappointment Resolution of 2023
Title
General Counsel to the Council of the District of Columbia Nicole Streeter Reappointment Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | Council | Resolution R25-0003, Effective from Jan 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 000671 |
2023-01-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0003 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0003 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |