DC PR25-0066 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Resolution R25-0042, Effective from Feb 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 002137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Resolution R25-0042, Effective from Feb 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 002137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification No. 0002 to Human Care Agreement No. CW100338 with Catholic Charities of the Archdiocese of Washington, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Modification No. 0002 to Human Care Agreement No. CW100338 with Catholic Charities of the Archdiocese of Washington, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0042, Effective from Feb 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 002137 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0042 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-02-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |