DC PR25-0093 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Melissa Tucker Confirmation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
District of Columbia Board of Ethics and Government Accountability Melissa Tucker Confirmation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-02-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0061, Effective from Feb 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 002171 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0061 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |