DC PR25-0193 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Resolution R25-0153, Effective from Jun 06, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 008462
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Resolution R25-0153, Effective from Jun 06, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 008462
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington International School Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2023
Title
Washington International School Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Council | Resolution R25-0153, Effective from Jun 06, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 008462 |
2023-06-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-06-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0153 |
2023-05-31 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-05-31 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0193 |
2023-05-26 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-05-15 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-05-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0193 Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |