DC PR25-0607 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DC Health Care Alliance Financial Eligibility Rulemaking Approval Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
DC Health Care Alliance Financial Eligibility Rulemaking Approval Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Council | Withdrawn |
2024-02-06 | Council | WITHDRAWN (Henderson) |
2024-01-23 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-01-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0607 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54608/Introduction/PR25-0607-Introduction.pdf |