DE HB255 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes several updates to the Boiler Safety Program. The Boiler Safety Program can issue certificates of compliance and the Secretary can grant variances. A 6th member is added to the Boiler Safety Council from associated labor unions. It adds an enforcement section for violators who fail to comply with Program requirements. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform with current drafting standards. Finally, the Act allows DNREC to establish fees for the Program that reasonably reflect the cost of the Program and defray its expenses. It therefore requires a 3/5 vote.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Boiler Safety Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2024-04-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-04-16 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-04-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 2 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-04-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Stricken in House | |
2024-04-16 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-03-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-03-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-14 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 255, and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |