FL H0067 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-14 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction
Status: Introduced on August 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-14 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction
Summary
Provides that certain links on Internet web pages are exempt from disclosure requirements applicable to political advertisements.
Title
Political Advertisements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction | |
2009-10-01 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-08-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0869 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
S1672 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01008; Amendment(s) adopted (164906) -SJ 01008; Substituted CS/CS/HB 869 (Died on Senate Calendar) -SJ 01008; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 01008
S1672 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01008; Amendment(s) adopted (164906) -SJ 01008; Substituted CS/CS/HB 869 (Died on Senate Calendar) -SJ 01008; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 01008
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0067&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |