FL H0075 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DEO to create web page accessible through its Internet website that provides certain information; provides purpose of web page; requires DEO to collect all local business information available to DEO; requires DEO to request relevant local government to provide any otherwise unavailable information; requires local governments to provide notice of changes in information collected by DEO; authorizes local government entities to provide summary that includes certain information for DEO's web page.
Title
Department of Economic Opportunity
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Combee [R] | Rep. Larry Ahern [R] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] |
Rep. Raymond Pilon [R] | Rep. Ross Spano [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-10 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 02/17/15, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB --Not considered |
2014-12-19 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-12-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0232 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/75 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0075/BillText/Filed/PDF |