FL H0181 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates interagency workgroup to share information, coordinate efforts, & collaborate on initiatives relating to natural hazards; requires certain agencies to designate liaisons to the workgroup; requires the Division of Emergency Management to prepare annual report; requires report to be posted on agency websites & submitted to the Governor & Legislature; providing an appropriation.
Title
Natural Hazards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#54 (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#54 (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Chapter No. 2017-48 | |
2017-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for SB 464 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-03-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/17 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 03/22/17, 9:15 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2017-03-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-15 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/15/17, 2:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 03/07/17, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0464 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 181 (Ch. 2017-48)