FL H0193 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 195 (Ch. 2016-118)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 195 (Ch. 2016-118)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to authorize the Legislature, by general law, to exempt from ad valorem taxation the assessed value of solar devices or renewable energy source devices that are subject to tangible personal property tax, to authorize the Legislature, by general law, to prohibit the consideration of the installation of such devices in determining the assessed value of residential and nonresidential real property for the purpose of ad valorem taxation, and to provide effective and expiration dates, etc.
Title
Solar or Renewable Energy Source Devices/Exemption from Certain Taxation and Assessment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#829 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#829 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 195 (Ch. 2016-118) | |
2016-03-09 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SJR 170 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2016-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (774531) |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-02-10 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16 |
2016-01-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | House | CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-21 | House | CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 01/21/16, 11:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 01/14/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall --Temporarily postponed |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-01 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-12-01 | House | Favorable by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 12/01/15, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-11-17 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-11-17 | House | Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 11/17/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-09-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0195 (Related) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-118, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 193 (Passed)
S0170 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 193 (Passed), CS/HB 195 (Ch. 2016-118)
S0172 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 195 (Ch. 2016-118), CS/HJR 193 (Passed)
S0170 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 193 (Passed), CS/HB 195 (Ch. 2016-118)
S0172 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 195 (Ch. 2016-118), CS/HJR 193 (Passed)