FL H0201 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-18 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction

Summary

Designates act as "Protecting Florida's Most Vulnerable Citizens Act"; requires owner or operator of child care facility to report background screening results to DCFS before employing person at child care facility; prohibits hiring of person with disqualifying offense without being granted exemption; requires child welfare services staff to obtain child welfare certification, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Services Personnel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-11-18 Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction
2009-11-01 Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-10-07 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0428 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0402302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0402305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
040230501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04023055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04023057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0402308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0402313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04023131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
040240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04091757Amended CodeSee Bill Text
041101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
042914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0429174Amended CodeSee Bill Text
043505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
043507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100257Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100259Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback