FL H0201 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Charlotte County to apply to Department of Economic Opportunity for designation of enterprise zone; provides application requirements; authorizes department to designate enterprise zone in Charlotte County; requires that department establish initial effective date for enterprise zone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enterprise Zones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Finance and Tax Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
2012-01-24 Now in Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 262
2012-01-24 Favorable by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 262
2012-01-20 On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 01/24/12, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 22
2011-10-17 Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 22
2011-09-23 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29000729Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback