FL H0235 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires physician to examine woman obtaining abortion for presence of detectable fetal heartbeat; revises informed consent for abortion procedure requirements; provides criminal penalties; prohibits termination of pregnancy when fetal heartbeat is detected; provides exceptions.
Title
Abortion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S792 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
390 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/235 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/235/BillText/Filed/PDF |