FL H0239 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Chapter No. 2013-26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Chapter No. 2013-26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certified optometrist to administer & prescribe ocular pharmaceutical agents; requires certified optometrist to complete board-approved course & examination on general & ocular pharmaceutical agents before administering or prescribing those agents; provides conditions under which holder of optometric faculty certificate may administer & prescribe oral ocular pharmaceutical agents; authorizes certified optometrist to perform certain eye examinations; requires reporting of adverse incidents in practice of optometry to DOH according to specified procedures.
Title
Practice of Optometry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#52 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#52 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Chapter No. 2013-26 | |
2013-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-15 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 278 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-03-22 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-22 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (298375) |
2013-03-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/13 |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-13 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2013-03-13 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-07 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 |
2013-03-05 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/07/13, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-21 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-02-07 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3 |
2013-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/07/13, 2:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0278 (Same As) 2013-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2013-26)
H0443 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2013-26)
H0443 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2013-26)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
463 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 0055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 0141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |