FL H0443 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2013-26)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2013-26)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits licensed optometrists from using certain terms to describe practices; requires licensed optometrists to immediately refer patient having certain eye conditions or diseases to ophthalmologist; requires postoperative care provided by licensed optometrist to be provided under established written protocol; requires patient be informed in writing of certain conditions before postoperative care; requires written affirmation by patient who elects not to be seen by ophthalmologist during postoperative period; requires licensed optometrist & operating ophthalmologist to each submit itemized statements & collect charges for postoperative care services rendered; requires that adverse optometry incidents be reported to DOH; requires DOH to review incidents, determine any disciplinary action, and publish trends of such incidents.
Title
Optometry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2013-26) |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0239 (Similar To) 2013-04-23 - Chapter No. 2013-26
S0278 (Similar To) 2013-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2013-26)
S0278 (Similar To) 2013-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2013-26)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
463 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 0141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/443 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0443/BillText/Filed/PDF |