FL H0313 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions & terminology relating to petitions for involuntary assessment & stabilization & involuntary services for substance abuse impaired persons.
Title
Marchman Act
Sponsors
House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-08 | House | CS referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-06 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S960 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6758 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6760 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6772 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6799 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 693 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |