FL H0313 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes licensed physicians who provide certain stem cell services & certain manufacturers & distributors of stems cells or stem cell products to register with DOH; requires such physicians to adhere to certain good manufacturing practices under federal laws; requires DOH to establish & maintain online registry identifying such physicians, manufacturers, & distributors & documenting physician agreements; requires DOH to update registry at least monthly.
Title
Voluntary Registration of Stem Cell Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-05 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-03 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-10-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S512 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages