FL H0341 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that specified persons who elect non-stacking limitations on their uninsured motorist insurance coverage are conclusively presumed to have made informed, knowing acceptance of limitations on behalf of all insureds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uninsured Motorist Insurance Coverage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#161 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-17 Chapter No. 2013-195
2013-06-14 Approved by Governor
2013-06-10 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2013-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2013-04-25SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2013-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2013-04-24SenateSubstituted for SB 706
2013-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2013-04-24SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2013-04-23SenateReceived
2013-04-18SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2013-04-18SenateIn Messages
2013-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2013-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13
2013-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-03-15HouseCS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
2013-03-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-03-14HouseCS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2013-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/14/13, 1:30 pm, 404 HOB
2013-03-06HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2013-03-06HouseFavorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/06/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB
2013-02-13HouseNow in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2013-02-13HouseFavorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2013-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/13/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2013-01-30HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2013-01-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0706 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 341 (Ch. 2013-195)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627727Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback