FL H0481 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Chapter No. 2022-82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Chapter No. 2022-82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting counties and certain municipalities from enacting ordinances, regulations, or policies that prevent certain electric utilities from installing temporary underground power panels and from requiring subsequent inspections of such panels as a condition of a Certificate of Occupancy under specified conditions, etc.
Title
Temporary Underground Power Panels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#595 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#595 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Chapter No. 2022-82 | |
2022-04-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-27 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1332 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-24 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-24 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment 679287 adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-13 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-13 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1332 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 481
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 488 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0484 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |