FL H0527 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from sales tax for parts and accessories necessary for industrial machinery or equipment under specified circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Exemptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Ways and Means Committee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee; Appropriations Committee
2019-11-05HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback