FL H0537 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies conditions under which business is considered home-based business; authorizes home-based business to operate in residential zone; prohibits local government from certain actions relating to licensure & regulation of home-based businesses; authorizes certain business owners to challenge local government actions; authorizes prevailing party to recover specified attorney fees & costs.
Title
Home-based Businesses
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Business and Professions Subcommittee | Rep. Byron Donalds [R] | Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R] |
Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-27 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 7 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-20 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 7 |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/20/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee; Commerce Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2020-01-31 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S778 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs