FL H0555 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides public records exemption for images obtained through use of traffic infraction detectors; provides for retroactive applicability of exemption; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Traffic Infraction Detectors
Sponsors
House Government Operations Subcommittee | House Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Charles McBurney [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-31 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-31 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/31/14, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-03-27 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2014-03-25 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-24 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 03/24/14, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0553 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
S0226 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-170
S1476 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
S1478 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
S0226 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-170
S1476 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
S1478 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation