FL H0577 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes student to use credit earned upon completion of apprenticeship or preapprenticeship program to satisfy specified high school graduation requirements; requires SBE to approve & identify registered apprenticeship & preapprenticeship programs.
Title
High School Graduation Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#612 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#612 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Chapter No. 2018-154 | |
2018-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-09 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for SB 856 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18 |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/18/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-11-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S856 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 577