FL H0651 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign; prohibits organization, entity, or person from intentionally soliciting state employees for fundraising or business purposes within specified areas during specified times; provides exceptions.
Title
State Employment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#542 (Y: 100 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#542 (Y: 100 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Chapter No. 2018-57 | |
2018-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-07 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Substituted for SB 950 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed; YEAS 100 NAYS 13 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18 |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S950 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 651
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 182 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |