FL H0665 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises calculation of school district's class size categorical allocation reduction to school average when maximum class size requirements are not met; provides for expenditure of funds; requires that district plan for compliance with class size maximums be posted to district website & provided to school advisory council of each noncompliant school; authorizes that plan be posted on noncompliant school's website.
Title
Maximum Class Size
Sponsors
House Education Committee | House Education Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. George Moraitis [R] | Rep. Robert Cortes [R] |
Rep. Fredrick Costello [R] | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-03-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 3 |
2015-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/15 |
2015-03-20 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-19 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/19/15, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2015-03-13 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-12 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0818 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |