FL H0677 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1052 (Ch. 2017-77)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1052 (Ch. 2017-77)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises right to use or threaten force, including deadly force, when person is in dwelling, residence, or vehicle; authorizes person to use or threaten to use nondeadly or deadly force in dwelling or residence.
Title
Justifiable Use of Force
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] |
Rep. Larry Metz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1052 (Ch. 2017-77) |
2017-04-27 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 1052 |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6 |
2017-04-22 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/24/17, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-29 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-28 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2017-03-24 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1052 (Same As) 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-77