FL H0691 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exception to general law; requires Division of Alcoholic Beverages & Tobacco of DBPR to issue special alcoholic beverage license to certain restaurants which meet space, seating, & minimum gross revenue requirements; provides conditions for revocation of such license or denial of pending application for such license.
Title
Town of Horseshoe Beach, Dixie County
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#601 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#601 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2024-01-24 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-10 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2023-12-19 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-12-01 | House | Filed |