FL H0735 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Preempts licensing of occupations to state; prohibits local governments from imposing or modifying licensing requirements; specifies certain local licensing may not be enforced; specifies certain specialty contractors are not required to register with Construction Industry Licensing Board; prohibits local governments from requiring certain specialty contractors to obtain license; specifies job scopes for which local government may not require license; authorizes counties & municipalities to issue journeyman licenses.
Title
Preemption of Local Occupational Licensing
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Harding [R] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. David Borrero [R] | Rep. Mike Giallombardo [R] |
Rep. Stan McClain [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] | Rep. John Snyder [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#52 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#52 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Chapter No. 2021-214 | |
2021-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-27 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 22 NAYS 18 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (305262, 359408, 706494, 934014) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 268 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-07 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed; YEAS 82, NAYS 32 |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021) |
2021-03-16 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-26 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S268 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 735 (Ch. 2021-214)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 1455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 5335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |