FL H0785 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes persons without license to practice barbering to perform limited barbering in licensed barbershops if certain requirements are met; authorizes Barbers' Board to discipline persons authorized to perform limited barbering.
Title
Limited Barbering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-27 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-12-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S704 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
476 | 144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 188 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
476 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |