FL H0801 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Veterans Employment Small Business Grant Program within DEO; directs Florida Is For Veterans, Inc., to administer program; authorizes corporation to accept & administer moneys; specifies grant amounts; requires small business to apply to & enter into agreement with corporation; requires corporation to notify appropriate regional small business development center of small business' participation; provides reporting requirements; provides for program termination; provides appropriations.
Title
Small Business Financial Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-11-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H387 (Same As) 2017-11-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/801 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/801/BillText/Filed/PDF |