FL H0827 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DEP to provide grants for certain projects to restore specified impaired water bodies & water segments.
Title
Wastewater Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-08 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Favorable by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda |
2023-02-21 | House | Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S458 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government