FL H0831 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for licensure by DACS; authorizes sheriff to provide supporting documentation to application for licensure; specifies duration of license; specifies conditions under which license must be revoked; authorizes sheriff to enter into agreement with owner of enhanced firearms training facility to conduct training for school guardian program at facility; exempts enhanced firearms training facility from complying with specified local government requirements in certain circumstances.
Title
Enhanced Firearms Training Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Original reference removed: Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-31 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-31 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-27 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1586 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Community Affairs